VA HB834 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-04 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Order of publication; electronic notice. Provides that a court may permit notice of an order of publication to be given by electronic means in addition to or in lieu of publication in a newspaper, under such terms and conditions as the court may direct. This bill is a recommendation of the Boyd-Graves Conference.
Title
Order of publication; electronic notice.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0159) | |
2020-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 159 (effective 7/1/20) | |
2020-02-26 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 4, 2020 | |
2020-02-26 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on February 26, 2020 |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-02-21 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-02-21 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB834ER) |
2020-02-21 | House | Enrolled |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary (14-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-01-28 | House | VOTE: (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-27 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2020-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2020-01-22 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Civil |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102380D |