VA HB832 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions
Pending: House Health, Welfare and Institutions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Certificate of public need; exception. Authorizes the State Health Commissioner to accept, review, and issue a certificate of public need for open heart services in Planning District 8, provided that certain conditions are met. The bill provides that the Commissioner shall not deny the application on the basis of the economic or service volumes impact on existing providers.
Title
Certificate of public need; open heart services in Northern Virginia.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 (6-Y 0-N) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2019 (6-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned HWI sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102448D |