VA HB827 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 4 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302)
Summary
State Lottery Department; powers of the Director and the Board. Authorizes the Director of the State Lottery Department to establish temporary bonus or incentive programs for payments to licensed sales agents that he determines will be cost effective and support increased sales of lottery products. The bill further provides that the Lottery Board not be required to approve the temporary bonus or incentive programs.
Title
State Lottery Department; powers of Director and Board.
Sponsors
Del. Thomas Gear [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0302) | |
2008-03-04 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 302 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-28 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-27 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-27 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB827ER) | |
2008-02-27 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (28-Y 12-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 1-N) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology | |
2008-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-08 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-08 | House: VOTE: --- PASSAGE (94-Y 5-N) | |
2008-02-08 | House: Read third time and passed House (94-Y 5-N) | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read second time and engrossed | |
2008-02-06 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-17 | House: Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080697856 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB827 |