VA HB82 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Civil penalties for violation of sewage usage ordinances. Allows any locality under an order of the Virginia Department of Environmental Quality issued pursuant to the authority of subdivision (8a) of §62.1-44.15 to adopt an ordinance establishing a uniform schedule of civil penalties for violations of ordinances governing the introduction of pollutants and wastes into the locality's public sewer system. Such civil penalties may not be more than $100 for the initial summons and not more than $150 for each additional summons.
Title
Public sewer system; locality may adopt ordinance establishing standard for use & services; penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0198) | |
2010-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 198 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-03-08 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-08 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-08 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB82ER) | |
2010-03-08 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-26 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-02-25 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-23 | Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2010-02-04 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-03 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-03 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-02 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB82H1 | |
2010-02-02 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 10104391D-H1 | |
2010-02-02 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-01 | House: Read first time | |
2010-01-29 | House: Committee substitute printed 10104391D-H1 | |
2010-01-29 | House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with substitute (21-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-28 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-26 | House: Assigned CC & T sub: #2 | |
2010-01-20 | House: Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns | |
2010-01-20 | House: Referred from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources by voice vote | |
2010-01-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2010-01-04 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10100628D |