VA HB809 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Child abuse and neglect; valid report or complaint; alleged abuser. Requires a local department of social services to conduct an investigation or family assessment when, among other things, a report or complaint of child abuse or neglect is received in which the alleged abuser (i) is the child's relative by blood, marriage, or adoption; (ii) is the child's caretaker or has supervisory control over such child; or (iii) resides or is regularly present in the same household as the child. The bill also amends the definition of "abused or neglected child" to accommodate this directive. Under current law, local departments are only required to conduct an investigation or family assessment when the alleged abuser is the child's parent or other caretaker.
Title
Child abuse and neglect; valid report or complaint, alleged abuser.
Sponsors
Del. Karrie Delaney [D] | Del. Mark Levine [D] | Del. Mark Cole [R] | Del. Patrick Hope [D] |
Del. Clinton Jenkins [D] | Del. Joseph McNamara [R] | Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-05 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-04 | House | Reported from Health, Welfare and Institutions with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Assigned App. sub: Health & Human Resources |
2020-02-04 | House | Committee substitute printed 20107362D-H1 |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Health, Welfare and Institutions |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103251D |