VA HB80 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-03 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Conditional guilty pleas. Gives the defendant the same right to enter a conditional guilty plea in a misdemeanor case in circuit court that exists in a felony case.
Title
Arraignment; defendant may enter conditional guilty plea in certain cases in circuit court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-24 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-20 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0052) | |
2014-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 52 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-19 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-19 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB80ER) |
2014-02-19 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (37-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-01-24 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-24 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (95-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-23 | House | Printed as engrossed 14100317D-E |
2014-01-23 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB80E |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-01-23 | House | Read second time |
2014-01-22 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-20 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-13 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal |
2013-12-10 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2013-12-10 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14100317D |