VA HB793 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-07 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Transportation planning. Requires the Department of Transportation, when reviewing certain proposed comprehensive plan amendments from localities in Planning District 8 (Northern Virginia), to recommend specific transportation improvements to the Northern Virginia Transportation Authority, the Commonwealth Transportation Board, and the appropriate locality that are necessary to ameliorate congestion.
Title
Transportation planning; VDOT to estimate costs necessary to mitigate or ameliorate congestion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0766) | |
2014-04-07 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 766 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-25 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-25 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB793ER) |
2014-02-25 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-18 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Printed as engrossed 14103270D-E |
2014-02-06 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB793E |
2014-02-06 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2014-02-06 | House | Read second time |
2014-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-04 | House | Reported from Transportation with amendment (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #4 |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103270D |