VA HB787 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-03 - Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Teaching or promotion of certain concepts in public elementary and secondary education; declaration as unlawful and discriminatory practice. Declares it an unlawful and discriminatory practice for any local school board or employee or contractor thereof to teach any public elementary or secondary school student to believe or promote to any such student as valid the belief that (i) one race or sex is inherently superior to another race or sex; (ii) an individual, by virtue of the individual's race or sex, is inherently racist, sexist, or oppressive, whether consciously or unconsciously; (iii) an individual should be discriminated against or receive adverse treatment solely or partly because of the individual's race or sex; (iv) an individual's moral character is necessarily determined by the individual's race or sex; or (v) an individual, by virtue of the individual's race or sex, bears responsibility for actions committed in the past by other members of the same race or sex, but permits any local school board or employee or contractor thereof to teach to any public elementary or secondary school student content that includes the past or present belief, by any individual or group, in any such concept. Teaching or promotion of certain concepts in public elementary and secondary education; declaration as unlawful and discriminatory practice. Declares it an unlawful and discriminatory practice for any local school board or employee or contractor thereof to teach any public elementary or secondary school student to believe or promote to any such student as valid the belief that (i) one race or sex is inherently superior to another race or sex; (ii) an individual, by virtue of the individual's race or sex, is inherently racist, sexist, or oppressive, whether consciously or unconsciously; (iii) an individual should be discriminated against or receive adverse treatment solely or partly because of the individual's race or sex; (iv) an individual's moral character is necessarily determined by the individual's race or sex; or (v) an individual, by virtue of the individual's race or sex, bears responsibility for actions committed in the past by other members of the same race or sex, but permits any local school board or employee or contractor thereof to teach to any public elementary or secondary school student content that includes the past or present belief, by any individual or group, in any such concept.
Title
Public elementary or secondary school student; moral and character education, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Education (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (50-Y 49-N) (Y: 50 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - House: VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) (Y: 50 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-09 - House - House: Reported from Education (11-Y 10-N) (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed by indefinitely in Education and Health (9-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Public Education |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-15 | House | VOTE: Passage (50-Y 49-N) |
2022-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (50-Y 49-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Printed as engrossed 22106442D-EH1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Engrossed by House - floor substitute HB787EH1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Pending question ordered |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Motion to pass by Amendment #10 by Delegate Tran agreed to (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Motion to pass by Amendment #9 by Delegate Jenkins agreed to (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Motion to pass by Amendment #8 by Delegate VanValkenburg agreed to (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Motion to pass by Amendment #7 by Delegate VanValkenburg agreed to (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Motion to pass by Amendment #6 by Delegate VanValkenburg agreed to (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Motion to pass by Amendment #5 by Delegate Helmer agreed to (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Motion to pass by Amendment #4 by Delegate Scott, D.L. agreed to (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Motion to pass by Amendment #3 by Delegate Hudson agreed to (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Motion to pass by Amendment #2 by Delegate VanValkenburg agreed to (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | VOTE: Agree To (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Motion to pass by Amendment #1 by Delegate VanValkenburg agreed to (50-Y 47-N) |
2022-02-14 | House | Amendment by Delegate Davis agreed to |
2022-02-14 | House | Substitute by Delegate Davis agreed to 22106442D-H1 |
2022-02-14 | House | Passed by temporarily |
2022-02-14 | House | Read second time |
2022-02-14 | House | Floor substitute printed 22106442D-H1 (Davis) |
2022-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-09 | House | Reported from Education (11-Y 10-N) |
2022-02-08 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2022-02-04 | House | Assigned Education sub: K-12 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22104087D |