VA HB784 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Congressional and state legislative districts. Provides criteria for the General Assembly to observe in drawing districts, including respect for political boundaries, equal population, racial and ethnic fairness, contiguity, compactness, and communities of interest. Use of political data or election results is prohibited unless necessary to ensure maximum competitiveness among the political parties present in the district or to ensure that racial or ethnic minorities can elect candidates of their choice.
Title
Congressional & state legislative districts; criteria for General Assembly to observe in drawing.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102205D |