VA HB78 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Failure to drive on right side of highways or observe traffic lanes; penalties. Increases the fine for failing to drive on the right side of highways or failing to observe traffic lanes from no more than $250 to $300 per violation.
Title
Failure to drive on right side of highways or observe traffic lanes; penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Transportation |
2016-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2015-12-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2015-12-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16100593D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB78 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB78+hil |