VA HB752 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-28 - House: Passed by in Transportation with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-01-28 - House: Passed by in Transportation with letter by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Traffic lights. Allows motorcycle, moped, and bicycle riders, in certain situations, to proceed through intersections controlled by traffic lights showing steady red signals.
Title
Traffic lights; allows motorcycle, etc., to proceed through intersections showing steady red signal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-01-28 | House: Passed by in Transportation with letter by voice vote | |
2010-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends passing by with letter by voice vote | |
2010-01-22 | House: Assigned Transportation sub: #2 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Transportation | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10103369D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+sum+HB752 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?101+ful+HB752+hil |