VA HB742 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0345)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Local regulation of unmanned aircraft. Authorizes a political subdivision, by ordinance or regulation, to regulate the take-off or landing of certain unmanned aircraft on property owned by the political subdivision in accordance with the rules and regulations adopted by the Department of Aviation. The bill requires the locality to report the ordinance or regulation to the Department and directs the Department to publish a summary on the locality's website. The bill also directs the Department, by January 1, 2021, to develop rules and regulations specific to take-offs and landings in consultation with representatives of the unmanned aircraft system industry, small and medium-sized businesses utilizing unmanned aircraft systems, localities, and other stakeholders. The bill has a delayed effective date of January 1, 2021.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Unmanned aircraft; political subdivision may regulate take-off and landing of system, etc.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-21 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N) (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - House - House: Reported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0345)
2020-03-12 Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 345 (effective 1/1/21)
2020-03-05 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., March 12, 2020
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2020
2020-02-27SenateSigned by President
2020-02-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-02-26HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB742ER)
2020-02-26HouseEnrolled
2020-02-21HouseVOTE: Adoption (96-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20108316D-S1 (96-Y 0-N)
2020-02-21HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-19SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateReconsideration of Senate passage agreed to by Senate (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenatePassed Senate with substitute (39-Y 0-N)
2020-02-19SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB742S1
2020-02-19SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108316D-S1
2020-02-19SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-19SenateRead third time
2020-02-18SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-17SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108316D-S1
2020-02-17SenateReported from Local Government with substitute (15-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03SenateReferred to Committee on Local Government
2020-02-03SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-01-31HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-31HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-01-30HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB742H1
2020-01-30HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106234D-H1
2020-01-30HouseRead second time
2020-01-29HouseRead first time
2020-01-27HouseReported from Communications, Technology and Innovation with substitute (22-Y 0-N)
2020-01-27HouseIncorporates HB1227 (LaRock)
2020-01-27HouseIncorporates HB311 (Gooditis)
2020-01-27HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106234D-H1
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-16HouseAssigned CT & I sub: Technology and Innovation
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102308D

Same As/Similar To

HB311 (Similar To) 2020-01-27 - Incorporated by Communications, Technology and Innovation
HB1227 (Similar To) 2020-01-27 - Incorporated by Communications, Technology and Innovation

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152926.3(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB742&201+sum+HB742
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB742+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB742H1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB742S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB742ER+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+CHAP0345+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H2102V0004+HB0742
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H21V0020+HB0742
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0273+HB0742
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S07V0091+HB0742
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0702HB0742+HB0742
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0710HB0742+HB0742
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0730HB0742+HB0742
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV0731HB0742+HB0742
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1139+HB0742

Bill Comments

feedback