VA HB1227 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Incorporated by Communications, Technology and Innovation
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-27 - Incorporated by Communications, Technology and Innovation
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Local regulation of unmanned aerial systems. Authorizes a political subdivision to adopt time, place, or manner regulations regarding the takeoff or landing of unmanned aerial systems on property owned by the political subdivision, provided such regulations are narrowly tailored to protect the health, safety, and welfare of the public. Takeoff and landing regulations adopted by a political subdivision shall not apply to persons authorized by federal regulations to operate an unmanned aircraft system provided such system is operated in an otherwise lawful manner and consistent with federal regulations. A political subdivision shall annually report to the Department of Aviation any regulations adopted pursuant to this section.
Title
Unmanned aerial systems; local regulation.
Sponsors
Del. Dave LaRock [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-27 | House | Incorporated by Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends incorporating (HB742-Bulova) by voice vote |
2020-01-16 | House | Assigned CT & I sub: Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee on Communications, Technology and Innovation |
2020-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20105013D |
Same As/Similar To
HB742 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0345)
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB1227 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB1227+hil |