VA HB739 | 2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous HB739

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-04 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Corporate income tax; combined reporting requirements. Requires, for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2021, unitary combined reporting for Virginia corporate income tax purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax, corporate; combined reporting requirements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-12-04HouseLeft in Finance
2020-02-05HouseContinued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote
2020-02-05HouseCommittee substitute printed to LIS only 20107403D-H1
2020-01-31HouseSubcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote
2020-01-29HouseAssigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #3
2020-01-06HouseReferred to Committee on Finance
2020-01-06HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103821D

Same As/Similar To

HB739 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Finance by voice vote

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
581406(n/a)See Bill Text
581424(n/a)See Bill Text
581429(n/a)See Bill Text
581443(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback