VA HB693 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vehicle registration; personal property tax relief. Requires the application for vehicle registration to include any additional information necessary to determine if a vehicle is a qualifying vehicle for the purpose of personal property tax relief. The bill requires vehicles held in a trust to be evaluated in the same manner as vehicles owned by a natural person.
Title
Vehicle registration; personal property tax relief.
Sponsors
Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-01 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0237) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 237 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2022 |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-02-28 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-02-28 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB693ER) |
2022-02-28 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-02-23 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Finance and Appropriations |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-01 | House | VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-01 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-31 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-01-28 | House | Read first time |
2022-01-26 | House | Reported from Finance (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2022-01-20 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22102760D |