VA HB685 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in General Laws
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco retail licensing; penalties. Prohibits any person from selling any tobacco product at retail without first obtaining a license from the Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority (the Authority). The bill prohibits the sale of tobacco products and hemp products intended for smoking from vending machines. The bill imposes civil penalties on licensees for selling tobacco products without a license and for selling tobacco products to persons under age 21. Licenses would be subject to annual renewal and subject to revocation for violations of federal, state, or local laws related to tobacco products. The bill creates the Tobacco Retail Administration Subfund for the purpose of funding the Authority's costs of administering licenses and enforcing laws related to tobacco retail licensing. Tobacco retail licensing; penalties. Prohibits any person from selling any tobacco product at retail without first obtaining a license from the Alcoholic Beverage Control Authority (the Authority). The bill prohibits the sale of tobacco products and hemp products intended for smoking from vending machines. The bill imposes civil penalties on licensees for selling tobacco products without a license and for selling tobacco products to persons under age 21. Licenses would be subject to annual renewal and subject to revocation for violations of federal, state, or local laws related to tobacco products. The bill creates the Tobacco Retail Administration Subfund for the purpose of funding the Authority's costs of administering licenses and enforcing laws related to tobacco retail licensing. The bill updates, for the purpose of the crime of selling or distributing tobacco products to a person younger than 21 years of age, the definition of "tobacco products" by including in such definition products currently defined as nicotine vapor products or alternative nicotine products. The bill also removes provisions prohibiting the attempt to purchase or possession of tobacco products and hemp products intended for smoking by persons younger than 21 years of age. The bill also removes the exception allowing the sale of tobacco products to active-duty military personnel who are 18 years of age or older.
Title
Tobacco retail licensing; penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in General Laws |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (7-Y 1-N) |
2022-01-21 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22103229D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 371.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 391 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 279.6 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
22 | 1 | 79.5 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 550 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
4 | 1 | 555 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
59 | 1 | 293.10 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |