VA HB676 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax subtraction for retirement income of certain federal employees. Establishes, starting in taxable year 2020, an income tax subtraction for 20 percent of the retirement income of retirees covered under the federal Civil Service Retirement System (CSRS).
Title
Income tax, state; subtraction for retirement income of certain federal employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Finance |
2020-01-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20102595D |