VA HB666 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Status: Introduced on January 8 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Commerce and Labor
Summary
Utility Transfers Act; investor-owned electric utilities. Prohibits the State Corporation Commission from approving an application by an investor-owned electric utility that was, as of July 1, 1999, bound by a rate case settlement adopted by the Commission that extended in its application beyond January 1, 2002, for authority to acquire assets or securities of an electric utility that divested its generation assets with approval of the Commission pursuant to ยง 56-590 prior to January 1, 2002, if the acquisition is likely to result in an increase in the rates of any investor-owned electric utility.
Title
Utility Transfers Act; prohibits SCC from approving an application by an investor-owned elec. util.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | House: Left in Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 080059616 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB666 |