VA HB661 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-12-03 - House: Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Line of Duty Death and Health Benefits Fund. Establishes the Line of Duty Death and Health Benefits Fund to pay the death and health insurance premium benefits to individuals covered by the Line of Duty Act (§9.1-400 et seq.) and the death benefit provided to state and local government employees who have been killed in action after being called to active duty services under Title 10 of the United States Code. The Fund is funded through a $.018 surcharge for E-911 service.
Title
Line of Duty Death and Health Benefits Trust Fund; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 (7-Y 1-N) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-12-03 | House: Left in Finance | |
2010-02-10 | House: Continued to 2011 in Finance by voice vote | |
2010-02-03 | House: Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2011 (7-Y 1-N) | |
2010-01-18 | House: Assigned Finance sub: #1 | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee on Finance | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102831D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
58 | 1 | 1730 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 400.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |