VA HB66 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]

Summary

Health insurance credits for retired school division employees. Requires school divisions to provide a health insurance credit of $4 per year of service to all retired members of local school divisions with at least 15 years of total creditable service. Currently, the $4 per year health insurance credit is provided only to teachers, and non-teacher school division employees are eligible for a credit of $1.50 per year of service, capped at $45 per month, if the locality has elected such coverage. An enactment clause provides that this measure does not apply to any local school division employee who retired on disability prior to July 1, 2018, if this measure would reduce the monthly credit currently payable to such former member. Eligible employees who retired prior to July 1, 2018, but who did not receive a health insurance credit prior to that date will only receive the $4 per year health insurance credit prospectively.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health insurance; credits for retired school division employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-08 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-13HouseLeft in Appropriations
2018-02-08HouseSubcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N)
2018-01-19HouseAssigned App. sub: Compensation & Retirement
2017-12-04HouseReferred to Committee on Appropriations
2017-12-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100818D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5111400(n/a)See Bill Text
5111401(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback