VA HB66 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-9)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 36-9)
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
New Economy Workforce Credential Grant Fund and Program established. Establishes the New Economy Workforce Credential Grant Fund and Program, to be administered by the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, for the purpose of disbursing funds to certain public institutions of higher education and other educational institutions in the Commonwealth to provide grants to Virginia students who complete certain noncredit workforce training programs at the institution and subsequently attain a relevant noncredit workforce credential. The bill also includes provisions relating to the amount and terms of such grants, academic credit for the attainment of noncredit workforce credentials, and reporting on completion of noncredit workforce training programs and attainment of noncredit workforce credentials.
Title
New Economy Workforce Credential Grant Fund and Program; established.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-03 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) (Y: 99 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) (Y: 99 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-09 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326) | |
2016-03-10 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 326 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-08 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-08 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/8/2016 |
2016-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-04 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-04 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB66ER) |
2016-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2016-03-03 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (96-Y 2-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Senate amendments agreed to by House (96-Y 2-N) |
2016-03-02 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendments (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Newman agreed to |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Committee amendment agreed to |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with amendment (14-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-15 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (96-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Read third time and passed House (96-Y 3-N) |
2016-02-12 | House | Printed as engrossed 16104963D-EH1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute with amendments HB66EH1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Amendments by Delegate Byron agreed to |
2016-02-12 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104963D-H1 |
2016-02-12 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-11 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104963D-H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Education with substitute (21-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-09 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (9-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2015-12-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2015-12-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16101082D |
Same As/Similar To
SB576 (Same As) 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)