VA SB576 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-25 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
New Economy Workforce Credential Grant Fund and Program established. Establishes the New Economy Workforce Credential Grant Fund and Program, to be administered by the State Council of Higher Education for Virginia, for the purpose of disbursing funds to certain public institutions of higher education and other educational institutions in the Commonwealth to provide grants to Virginia students who complete certain noncredit workforce training programs at the institution and subsequently attain a relevant noncredit workforce credential. The bill also includes provisions relating to the amount and terms of such grants, academic credit for the attainment of noncredit workforce credentials, and reporting on completion of noncredit workforce training programs and attainment of noncredit workforce credentials.
Title
New Economy Workforce Credential Grant Program; established, Fund created, report.
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Ruff [R] | Sen. Benton Chafin [R] | Sen. Lynwood Lewis [D] | Sen. John Miller [D] |
Sen. David Suetterlein [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-07 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N) (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-02 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - House - House: Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N) (Y: 22 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-12 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-11 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-25 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0470) | |
2016-03-25 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 470 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, Sunday, April 10, 2016 | |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Communicated to Governor on 3/11/16 |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-03-10 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Bill text as passed Senate and House (SB576ER) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Enrolled |
2016-03-08 | Senate | House amendments agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (94-Y 2-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Passed House with amendments (94-Y 2-N) |
2016-03-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended |
2016-03-07 | House | Committee on Appropriations amendments agreed to |
2016-03-07 | House | Committee on Education amendment agreed to |
2016-03-07 | House | Read third time |
2016-03-04 | House | Read second time |
2016-03-02 | House | Reported from Appropriations with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | House | Assigned App. sub: Higher Education |
2016-02-22 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2016-02-22 | House | Reported from Education with amendment (21-Y 1-N) |
2016-02-17 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-02-17 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-17 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Printed as engrossed 16105100D-ES1 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute with amendments SB576ES1 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Amendments by Senator Ruff agreed to |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reading of amendments waived |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105100D-S1 |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Read second time |
2016-02-12 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105100D-S1 |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Reported from Education and Health with substitute (15-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Assigned Education sub: Higher Education |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Education and Health |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103188D |
Same As/Similar To
HB66 (Same As) 2016-03-10 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0326)