VA HB658 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Commission to Investigate the May 31, 2019, Virginia Beach Mass Shooting; report. Establishes an independent commission to investigate the May 31, 2019, Virginia Beach mass shooting (the Commission). The Commission consists of 21 members appointed as follows: five members appointed by the Speaker of the House of Delegates, five members appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules, and 10 members appointed by the Governor. The Superintendent of State Police serves ex officio as a nonvoting member. The Commission is charged with investigating the underlying motive for the May 31, 2019, Virginia Beach mass shooting, investigating the gunman's entire prior employment history with the City of Virginia Beach and his interactions with coworkers and supervisors, determining how the gunman was able to carry out his actions, identifying any obstacles confronted by first responders, identifying and examining the security procedures and protocols in place immediately prior to the shootings, examining the post-shooting communications between law enforcement and families of the victims, and developing recommendations regarding improvements that can be made in the Commonwealth's laws, policies, procedures, systems, and institutions, as well as those of other governmental agencies and private providers.
Title
Virginia Beach mass shooting; independent commission to investigate.
Sponsors
Del. Kelly Convirs-Fowler [D] | Del. Jason Miyares [R] | Del. Joshua Cole [D] | Del. Glenn Davis [R] |
Del. Patrick Hope [D] | Del. Chris Hurst [D] | Del. Kaye Kory [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Ibraheem Samirah [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-31 | House | Reported from Rules (18-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Rules |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20104843D |