VA HB651 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0835)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0835)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Use of commissioners in eminent domain cases. Reinstates the option of the landowner to choose between commissioners and juries to hear an eminent domain case. The option to choose commissioners was eliminated by Chapter 586 of the 2006 Acts of Assembly. The bill also equalizes the pay of jurors and commissioners in condemnation cases with that of regular jurors. The provisions of this bill apply only to actions filed on or after July 1, 2010.
Title
Eminent domain cases; reinstates option of landowner to choose between commissioner & jury to hear.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-21 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-21 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N) (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-05 - House - House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 2-N) (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 1-N) (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-01-27 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0835) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Enacted, Chapter 835 (effective 7/1/10) | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Signed by President as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Signed by Speaker as reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled bill text (HB651ER2) | |
2010-04-21 | House: Reenrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2010-04-21 | Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (39-Y 0-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (93-Y 1-N) | |
2010-04-21 | House: House concurred in Governor's recommendation (93-Y 1-N) | |
2010-04-20 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-04-13 | House: Governor's recommendation received by House | |
2010-03-13 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2010-03-12 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2010-03-12 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB651ER) | |
2010-03-12 | House: Enrolled | |
2010-03-05 | House: VOTE: --- ADOPTION (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-05 | House: Senate amendment agreed to by House (99-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-04 | House: Placed on Calendar | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 2-N) | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Reading of amendment waived | |
2010-03-03 | Senate: Read third time | |
2010-03-02 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) | |
2010-03-01 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (13-Y 1-N) | |
2010-02-17 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-02-11 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2010-02-10 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-10 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2010-02-09 | House: Printed as engrossed 10102184D-E | |
2010-02-09 | House: Engrossed by House as amended HB651E | |
2010-02-09 | House: Committee amendment agreed to | |
2010-02-09 | House: Read second time | |
2010-02-08 | House: Read first time | |
2010-02-03 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendment (22-Y 0-N) | |
2010-01-27 | House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (8-Y 2-N) | |
2010-01-19 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2010-01-12 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2010-01-12 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/10 10102184D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 1 | 100 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 209 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 213 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 214 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 219 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 220 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 227.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 227.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 235 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
25 | 1 | 318 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
62 | 1 | 98 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
8 | 01 | 187 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |