VA HB644 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0176)
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 3 2008 - 100% progression
Action: 2008-03-05 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0176)
Summary
Master Settlement Agreement; enforcement requirements for tobacco product manufacturers; national sales information. Requires every tobacco product manufacturer whose cigarettes are to be sold in the Commonwealth to submit, as a condition of selling cigarettes in the Commonwealth, to the Attorney General a true and correct copy of each annual return or report filed with the Alcohol and Tobacco Tax and Trade Bureau for federal excise tax purposes. Failure to submit the annual return or report will result in the loss of the tobacco manufacturer’s authority to sell cigarettes in the Commonwealth after 30 days’ notice. This bill also provides provisions for the protection of the annual return data once in the possession of the Attorney General.
Title
Master Settlement Agreement; enforcement requirements for tobacco product manufacturers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-03-05 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0176) | |
2008-03-03 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 176 (effective 7/1/08) | |
2008-02-25 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2008-02-22 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2008-02-21 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB644ER) | |
2008-02-21 | House: Enrolled | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Passed Senate (39-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-20 | Senate: Read third time | |
2008-02-19 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-18 | Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (14-Y 0-N 1-A) | |
2008-02-12 | Senate: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-02-08 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2008-02-07 | House: Communicated to Senate | |
2008-02-07 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-07 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) | |
2008-02-06 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB644H1 | |
2008-02-06 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 081487536-H1 | |
2008-02-06 | House: Read second time | |
2008-02-05 | House: Read first time | |
2008-02-04 | House: Committee substitute printed 081487536-H1 | |
2008-02-01 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-24 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Civil | |
2008-01-22 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-22 | House: Referred from General Laws by voice vote | |
2008-01-08 | House: Referred to Committee on General Laws | |
2008-01-08 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086919536 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB644 |