VA HB63 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0214)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0214)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Private security; compliance agent experience; surety bond. Removes the requirement that a compliance agent for a private security services business have either five years of experience or three years of managerial or supervisory experience in a private security services business, a state or local law-enforcement agency, or a related field. The bill also removes the option for a private security services business or a private security services training school to be covered by a bond in lieu of liability insurance.
Title
Private security; compliance agent experience, surety bond.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0214) | |
2018-03-09 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 214 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-02 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-02 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 2, 2018 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB63ER) |
2018-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (15-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-31 | House | VOTE: PASSAGE (98-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Read third time and passed House (98-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-30 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2018-01-29 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-25 | House | Reported from General Laws (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-19 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #3 |
2017-12-04 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2017-12-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18101437D |