VA HB622 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 15 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-11 - Failed to pass in House
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Entering vehicle; interference with rights of owner. Provides that any person who, without the consent of the owner or other person in charge of a motor vehicle, enters into a motor vehicle occupied by such owner or other person with the intent to interfere with the rights of such owner or other person to use such vehicle free from interference is guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor.
Title
Entering occupied motor vehicle; interference with rights of owner, penalty.
Sponsors
Del. Robert Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 100 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-04 - House - House: VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) (Y: 1 N: 100 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2016-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-29 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-16 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | House | Failed to pass in House |
2016-03-11 | House | No further action taken |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senators: Obenshain, Sturtevant, Deeds |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Conferees appointed by Senate |
2016-03-09 | House | Delegates: Bell, R.B., Albo, Herring |
2016-03-09 | House | Conferees appointed by House |
2016-03-09 | House | House acceded to request |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate requested conference committee |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate insisted on substitute (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | VOTE: REJECTED (1-Y 97-N) |
2016-03-04 | House | Senate substitute rejected by House 16105930D-S1 (1-Y 97-N) |
2016-03-03 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB622S1 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to 16105930D-S1 |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2016-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 16105930D-S1 |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (13-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-02-17 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-16 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-16 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-15 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB622H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16105287D-H1 |
2016-02-15 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-12 | House | Read first time |
2016-02-10 | House | Committee substitute printed 16105287D-H1 |
2016-02-10 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice with substitute (22-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (10-Y 1-N) |
2016-01-14 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Criminal Law |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102352D |