VA HB619 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Transportation
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Commonwealth Mass Transit Fund; allocation to Fredericksburg Regional Transit. Requires that a minimum of $1 million annually be allocated to Fredericksburg Regional Transit from the Commonwealth Mass Transit Fund. The funding is contingent on localities served by Fredericksburg Regional Transit continuing to support Fredericksburg Regional Transit by at least the amount of funding provided in the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2019.
Title
Commonwealth Mass Transit Fund; allocation to Fredericksburg Regional Transit.
Sponsors
Del. Joshua Cole [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Transportation |
2020-01-30 | House | Subcommittee recommends striking from docket (10-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-14 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Transportation Systems |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101564D |