VA HB616 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Congressional and legislative districts; certain prohibitions. Prohibits any congressional district or district for the Senate of Virginia or House of Delegates from being drawn (i) for the purpose of favoring or disfavoring any political party, incumbent legislator or member of Congress, or potential candidate or (ii) to restrict or deny the ability of any racial or language minority to participate in the political process and elect a preferred candidate of choice.
Title
Congressional and legislative districts; certain prohibitions.
Sponsors
Del. Marcia Price [D] | Del. Jeffrey Bourne [D] | Del. Jerrauld Jones [D] | Del. Sam Rasoul [D] |
Del. Debra Rodman [D] | Del. Marcus Simon [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2018-02-06 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (4-Y 2-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18102790D |