VA HB614 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB614
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-23 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote
Pending: House General Laws Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage control; definition of "day spa." Removes the requirement that in order to qualify as a day spa for ABC purposes, a commercial establishment must offer to the public both licensed massage therapy and licensed barbering or cosmetology services. The bill provides that a commercial establishment qualifies as a day spa so long as the commercial establishment offers to the public licensed barbering or cosmetology services.
Title
Alcoholic beverage control; definition of "day spa."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-23 | House | Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote |
2020-01-21 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20101614D |
Same As/Similar To
HB614 (Carry Over) 2020-01-23 - Continued to 2021 in General Laws by voice vote
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB614 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB614+hil |