VA HB602 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB602
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; scholastic records; charges. Provides that, upon request, scholastic records shall be furnished electronically once per academic quarter and physically once per academic year at no charge to the student who is the subject thereof or the student's parent or legal guardian.
Title
Virginia Freedom of Information Act; scholastic records, charges.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 6-N) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 6-N) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (13-Y 6-N) (Y: 13 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-05 | House | Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote |
2020-02-05 | House | Subcommittee recommends continuing to 2021 by voice vote |
2020-01-31 | House | Assigned App. sub: Elementary & Secondary Education |
2020-01-30 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-30 | House | Reported from General Laws (13-Y 6-N) |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-28 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-24 | House | Assigned GL sub: Open Government/Procurement |
2020-01-06 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-06 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100489D |
Same As/Similar To
HB602 (Carry Over) 2020-02-05 - Continued to 2021 in Appropriations by voice vote