VA HB585 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on March 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-17 - House sustained Governor's veto
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Home-based firearms dealers; prohibited near schools; penalties. Provides that no home-based firearms dealer, as defined in the bill, shall be engaged in the business of selling, trading, or transferring firearms at wholesale or retail within 1.5 miles of any elementary or middle school, including buildings and grounds. The bill provides that any person who willfully violates such prohibition is guilty of a Class 2 misdemeanor for a first offense and guilty of a Class 1 misdemeanor for a second or subsequent offense.
Title
Home-based firearms dealers; prohibited near schools, penalties.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) (Y: 9 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (51-Y 47-N) (Y: 51 N: 47 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-02 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-26 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-25 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-17 | House | House sustained Governor's veto |
2024-03-26 | Governor: Vetoed by Governor | |
2024-03-11 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 8, 2024 | |
2024-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 11, 2024 |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Signed by President |
2024-03-05 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2024-03-05 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB585ER) |
2024-03-05 | House | Enrolled |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Passed Senate (20-Y 19-N) |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Read third time |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (9-Y 6-N) |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2024-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2024-02-08 | House | VOTE: Passage (51-Y 47-N) |
2024-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House (51-Y 47-N) |
2024-02-07 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2024-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2024-02-02 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-30 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-26 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-26 | House | Reported from Public Safety (12-Y 10-N) |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2024-01-25 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 4-N) |
2024-01-16 | House | Assigned PS sub: Firearms |
2024-01-09 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2024-01-09 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24104573D |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 4200 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 4201.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |