VA HB584 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 27 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-27 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Competency to stand trial; recommended treatment. Provides that in cases in which the evaluation report prepared by a qualified mental health expert indicates that the defendant requires treatment, the report shall state whether inpatient or outpatient treatment is recommended.
Title
Competency to stand trial; recommended treatment by qualified mental health expert.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-07 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - House - House: Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-29 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0329) | |
2014-03-27 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 329 (effective 7/1/14) | |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Signed by President |
2014-02-26 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2014-02-26 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB584ER) |
2014-02-26 | House | Enrolled |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-24 | Senate | Read third time |
2014-02-21 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Reported from Courts of Justice (11-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2014-02-07 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-07 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2014-02-06 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2014-02-05 | House | Read first time |
2014-02-03 | House | Reported from Courts of Justice (22-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-29 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (10-Y 0-N) |
2014-01-09 | House | Assigned Courts sub: Mental Health |
2014-01-07 | House | Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice |
2014-01-07 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14101192D |
Same As/Similar To
SB357 (Same As) 2014-04-06 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0739)