VA HB580 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Left in Commerce and Energy
Pending: House Commerce and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Covenants not to compete; health care professionals; civil penalty. Adds health care professionals as a category of employee with whom no employer shall enter into, enforce, or threaten to enforce a covenant not to compete. The bill defines "health care professional" as any physician, nurse, nurse practitioner, physician's assistant, pharmacist, social worker, dietitian, physical and occupational therapist, and medical technologist authorized to provide health care services in the Commonwealth. The bill provides that any employer that violates the prohibition against covenants not to compete with an employee health care professional is subject to a civil penalty of $10,000 for each violation. Covenants not to compete; health care professionals; civil penalty. Adds health care professionals as a category of employee with whom no employer shall enter into, enforce, or threaten to enforce a covenant not to compete. The bill defines "health care professional" as any physician, nurse, nurse practitioner, physician's assistant, pharmacist, social worker, dietitian, physical and occupational therapist, and medical technologist authorized to provide health care services in the Commonwealth. The bill provides that any employer that violates the prohibition against covenants not to compete with an employee health care professional is subject to a civil penalty of $10,000 for each violation.
Title
Covenants not to compete; health care professionals, civil penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | House | Left in Commerce and Energy |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (4-Y 3-N) |
2022-01-28 | House | Assigned sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101943D |