VA HB573 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-16 - Left in Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Students with limited English proficiency; alternatives to Standards of Learning English reading assessments. Requires the Board of Education to authorize the use of an English language proficiency assessment, such as the WIDA ACCESS for ELLs assessment, as an alternative to any Standards of Learning English reading assessment for students in grades three through eight with limited English proficiency.
Title
Students with limited English proficiency; alternatives to SOL English reading assessments.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-16 | House | Left in Education |
2016-02-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table by voice vote |
2016-01-15 | House | Assigned Education sub: Education Innovation |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Education |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16102607D |
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+sum+HB573 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?161+ful+HB573+hil |