VA HB567 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-11 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Real Estate Board; duties of real estate licensees; residential real estate transactions. Authorizes the Real Estate Board to take a disciplinary case against a licensee under advisement, defer a finding in such case, and dismiss such action upon terms and conditions set by the Board. Among other things, the bill (i) authorizes the Real Estate Board to grant exemptions or waive or reduce the number of continuing education hours required in cases of certified illness or undue hardship; (ii) requires the supervising broker of a branch office to provide the name and license number of each real estate licensee working in the branch; (iii) prohibits a real estate licensee in a residential real estate transaction from acting as a nonstandard agent; (iv) provides that standard agency only applies in residential real estate transactions; (v) clarifies that the agency provisions apply unless they are modified by the brokerage agreement; (vi) provides that the law relating to real estate licensees retained by sellers, buyers, tenants, or landlords to lease property or to manage property only applies to residential real estate transactions; (vii) provides that notwithstanding any other provision of law requiring written brokerage agreements or governing the duties of licensees, nothing shall be construed to require that a written agreement between a licensee and a prospective buyer or tenant be executed prior to the licensee's showing properties to the prospective buyer or tenant; (viii) deletes the disclosure of brokerage obligation in commercial transactions; and (ix) provides that commercial agents may only act as agents or independent contractors. The bill also provides that nothing creates a civil cause of action against a real estate licensee for false information. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Real Estate Board; duties of real estate licensees, exemption, etc., of continuing education hours.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-24 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-03 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - House - House: Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-26 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-11 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0334) | |
2016-03-11 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 334 (effective 7/1/16) | |
2016-03-04 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, March 11, 2016 | |
2016-03-04 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on 3/4/16 |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2016-02-29 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2016-02-29 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB567ER) |
2016-02-29 | House | Enrolled |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Read third time |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Reported from General Laws and Technology (10-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee on General Laws and Technology |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2016-02-03 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-03 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (97-Y 0-N) |
2016-02-02 | House | Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB567H1 |
2016-02-02 | House | Committee substitute agreed to 16104502D-H1 |
2016-02-02 | House | Read second time |
2016-02-01 | House | Read first time |
2016-01-28 | House | Committee substitute printed 16104502D-H1 |
2016-01-28 | House | Reported from General Laws with substitute (21-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-26 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendment(s) (7-Y 0-N) |
2016-01-18 | House | Assigned GL sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2016-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2016-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/13/16 16103925D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
54 | 1 | 2105 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2105.3 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2110.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2130 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2135 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2138 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2138.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2139.01 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2139.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2141 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2142 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
54 | 1 | 2142.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |