VA HB540 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-13 - Left in Privileges and Elections
Pending: House Privileges and Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Elections; definition of "party" or "political party." Changes the definition of "party" or "political party" to mean an organization of citizens of the Commonwealth that, at either of the two preceding statewide general elections, received at least three percent of the total vote cast for any statewide office filled in that election. Currently, to be defined as a party or political party, such an organization must receive at least 10 percent of the total vote cast for any statewide office filled at either of the two preceding statewide general elections.
Title
Elections; changes definition of "party" or "political party."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 1-N) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-13 | House | Left in Privileges and Elections |
2018-02-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passing by indefinitely (5-Y 1-N) |
2018-01-22 | House | Assigned P & E sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Privileges and Elections |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100144D |