VA HB523 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0235)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-13 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0235)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fire insurance; earthquake coverage notice. Requires fire insurance policies or contracts that exclude coverage for earthquake damage to provide a written notice that (i) conspicuously states that earthquake coverage is excluded unless purchased by endorsement and (ii) if such coverage is otherwise available from the insurer, states that information regarding earthquake insurance is available from the insurer or the insurance agent. The measure applies to policies issued or renewed on or after January 1, 2013.
Title
Fire insurance policy; notice regarding earthquake exclusion.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) (Y: 37 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 1-N) (Y: 15 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-13 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-07 - House - House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0235) | |
2012-03-13 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 235 (effective 1/1/13) | |
2012-03-01 | Senate: Signed by President | |
2012-02-29 | House: Signed by Speaker | |
2012-02-29 | House: Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB523ER) | |
2012-02-29 | House: Enrolled | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Passed Senate (37-Y 2-N) | |
2012-02-23 | Senate: Read third time | |
2012-02-22 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (39-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-20 | Senate: Reported from Commerce and Labor (15-Y 1-N) | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-02-14 | Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed | |
2012-02-13 | House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-13 | House: Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) | |
2012-02-10 | House: Engrossed by House - committee substitute HB523H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Committee substitute agreed to 12104921D-H1 | |
2012-02-10 | House: Read second time | |
2012-02-09 | House: Read first time | |
2012-02-07 | House: Committee substitute printed 12104921D-H1 | |
2012-02-07 | House: Reported from Commerce and Labor with substitute (22-Y 0-N) | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12101844D |
Same As/Similar To
SB369 (Same As) 2012-03-22 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0346)