VA HB5109 | 2020 | 1st Special Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-0)
Status: Passed on November 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-09 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Department of Criminal Justice Services; law-enforcement officer training and qualifications. Requires the Department of Criminal Justice Services (the Department) to develop a uniform curriculum and lesson plans for the compulsory minimum entry-level, in-service, and advanced training standards to be employed by criminal justice training academies approved by the Department when conducting training. The bill also requires the Department to include the recognition of implicit biases in interacting with persons who have a mental illness, substance use disorder, or developmental or cognitive disability in its (i) training standards and model policies; (ii) compulsory training standards for basic training and recertification of law-enforcement officers; and (iii) operating procedures, guidelines, and standards for community policing in order to ensure sensitivity to and awareness of systemic and individual racism, cultural diversity, and the potential for bias-based profiling. The bill also requires the Department to include training in de-escalation techniques and training in the lawful use of force, including the use of force only when necessary to protect the law-enforcement officer or another person in the compulsory training standards for basic training and recertification.
Title
Law-enforcement officer training & qualifications; DCJS to develop uniform curriculum & plans, etc.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-09 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 39-N) (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (60-Y 36-N) (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 14-N) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate: Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 18-N) (Y: 21 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-07 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (60-Y 36-N) (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 14-N) (Y: 24 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee substitute reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-01 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-25 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-24 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-16 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-04 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-31 - House - House: Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-25 - House - House: Reported from Public Safety with amendment (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-09 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0048) | |
2020-11-09 | House | Enacted, Chapter 48 (effective 3/1/21) |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Signed by President as reenrolled |
2020-11-09 | House | Signed by Speaker as reenrolled |
2020-11-09 | House | Reenrolled bill text (HB5109ER2) |
2020-11-09 | House | Reenrolled |
2020-11-09 | Governor: Governor's recommendation adopted | |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Senate concurred in Governor's recommendation (21-Y 18-N) |
2020-11-09 | House | VOTE: Adoption (58-Y 39-N) |
2020-11-09 | House | House concurred in Governor's recommendation (58-Y 39-N) |
2020-10-28 | House | Governor's recommendation received by House |
2020-10-21 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., October 28, 2020 | |
2020-10-21 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on October 21, 2020 |
2020-10-14 | Senate | Signed by President |
2020-10-14 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2020-10-14 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB5109ER) |
2020-10-14 | House | Enrolled |
2020-10-07 | House | VOTE: Adoption (60-Y 36-N) |
2020-10-07 | House | Senate substitute agreed to by House 20201293D-S2 (60-Y 36-N) |
2020-10-07 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (24-Y 14-N) |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - floor substitute HB5109S2 |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Substitute by Senator Locke agreed to |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Committee substitute reconsidered (38-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-10-02 | Senate | Floor substitute printed 20201293D-S2 (Locke) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Passed by for the day |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reconsideration of passage agreed to by Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Passed Senate with substitute (40-Y 0-N) |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB5109S1 |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Committee substitute agreed to |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Reading of substitute waived |
2020-10-01 | Senate | Read third time |
2020-09-25 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (36-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-24 | Senate | Reported from Finance and Appropriations (16-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance and Appropriations |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Committee substitute printed 20201189D-S1 |
2020-09-16 | Senate | Reported from Judiciary with substitute (12-Y 0-N) |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on the Judiciary |
2020-09-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2020-09-04 | House | VOTE: Passage (97-Y 1-N) |
2020-09-04 | House | Read third time and passed House (97-Y 1-N) |
2020-09-03 | House | Printed as engrossed 20200924D-E |
2020-09-03 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB5109E |
2020-09-03 | House | Committee amendment agreed to |
2020-09-03 | House | Read second time |
2020-09-02 | House | Read first time |
2020-08-31 | House | Reported from Appropriations (22-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-25 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-08-25 | House | Reported from Public Safety with amendment (21-Y 0-N) |
2020-08-21 | House | Referred to Committee on Public Safety |
2020-08-21 | House | Presented and ordered printed 20200924D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 2 | 1705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
9 | 1 | 112.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |