VA HB509 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0318)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0318)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Comprehensive plan; solar facilities. Provides that a solar facility subject to provisions requiring the facility to be substantially in accord with a locality's comprehensive plan shall be deemed to be substantially in accord with the comprehensive plan if (i) such proposed solar facility is located in a zoning district that allows such solar facilities by right or (ii) such proposed solar facility is designed to serve the electricity or thermal needs of the property upon which such facility is located, or will be owned or operated by an eligible customer-generator or eligible agricultural customer-generator under ?§56-594 or by a small agricultural generator under ?§56-594.2. The bill authorizes a locality to allow for a substantial accord review for other solar facilities to be advertised and approved concurrently in a public hearing process with a rezoning, special exception, or other approval process. This bill is identical to SB 179.
Title
Comprehensive plan; solar facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-08 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-02 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-19 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0318) | |
2018-03-19 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 318 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-05 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-05 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 5, 2018 |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-02-27 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-02-27 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB509ER) |
2018-02-27 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (12-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-02-08 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-08 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-07 | House | Printed as engrossed 18103844D-E |
2018-02-07 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB509E |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-02-07 | House | Read second time |
2018-02-06 | House | Read first time |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (22-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-31 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting with amendments (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-17 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18103844D |