VA HB506 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 5 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-12 - Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

County manager plan; election of board members by instant runoff voting. Provides that, in a county operating under the county manager plan of government (Arlington County), elections to nominate candidates for and to elect candidates to the board of supervisors may be conducted by instant runoff voting, which the bill describes as the method of casting and tabulating votes in which (i) voters rank candidates in order of preference, (ii) tabulation proceeds in rounds such that in each round either a candidate or candidates are elected or the last-place candidate is defeated, (iii) votes for voters' next-ranked candidates are transferred from elected or defeated candidates, and (iv) tabulation ends when the number of candidates elected equals the number of offices to be filled. The bill provides that the State Board of Elections may promulgate regulations governing elections determined by instant runoff voting. The bill provides that any costs incurred by the Department of Elections related to technological changes necessary for the implementation of ranked choice voting pursuant to the bill shall be charged to the localities exercising the option to proceed with ranked choice voting.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

County manager plan; election of board members by instant runoff voting.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-02 - House - House: VOTE: Adoption (63-Y 36-N) (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N) (Y: 20 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 4-N) (Y: 11 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 5-N) (Y: 7 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (68-Y 30-N) (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-31 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (18-Y 3-N) (Y: 18 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-12 Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2020
2020-03-12HouseEnrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 12, 2020
2020-03-06SenateSigned by President
2020-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2020-03-05HouseBill text as passed House and Senate (HB506ER)
2020-03-05HouseEnrolled
2020-03-02HouseVOTE: Adoption (63-Y 36-N)
2020-03-02HouseSenate substitute agreed to by House 20108690D-S1 (63-Y 36-N)
2020-03-02HousePlaced on Calendar
2020-02-27SenatePassed Senate with substitute (21-Y 19-N)
2020-02-27SenateEngrossed by Senate - committee substitute HB506S1
2020-02-27SenateCommittee substitute agreed to 20108690D-S1
2020-02-27SenateReading of substitute waived
2020-02-27SenateRead third time
2020-02-26SenateConstitutional reading dispensed (38-Y 0-N)
2020-02-25SenateCommittee substitute printed 20108690D-S1
2020-02-25SenateReported from Finance and Appropriations with substitute (11-Y 4-N)
2020-02-18SenateRereferred to Finance and Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateReported from Privileges and Elections (8-Y 5-N)
2020-02-07SenateReferred to Committee on Privileges and Elections
2020-02-07SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-06HouseVOTE: Passage (68-Y 30-N)
2020-02-06HouseRead third time and passed House (68-Y 30-N)
2020-02-05HousePrinted as engrossed 20100883D-E
2020-02-05HouseEngrossed by House as amended HB506E
2020-02-05HouseCommittee amendment agreed to
2020-02-05HouseRead second time
2020-02-04HouseRead first time
2020-01-31HouseReported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendment (18-Y 3-N)
2020-01-17HouseAssigned CC & T sub: Land Use
2020-01-04HouseReferred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns
2020-01-04HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100883D

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
152705(n/a)See Bill Text
152705.1(n/a)See Bill Text

Virginia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+sum+HB506&201+sum+HB506
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB506+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB506E+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB506S1+hil
Texthttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+ful+HB506ER+hil
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H0702V0008+HB0506
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+H07V0056+HB0506
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV0485+HB0506
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S08V0114+HB0506
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+S05V0442+HB0506
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1050HB0506+HB0506
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+SV1185HB0506+HB0506
Roll Callhttp://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?201+vot+HV1687+HB0506

Bill Comments

feedback