VA HB496 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Summary
Crimes; the definition of "predicate criminal act" under the Crimes by Gangs Act. Includes within the definition the shooting at certain vehicles (§ 18.2-154) and the shooting within an occupied dwelling (§ 18.2-279).
Title
Crimes by Gangs Act; definition of predicate criminal act .
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2008-02-06 | House: Assigned App. sub: Public Safety (Sherwood) | |
2008-02-04 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-02-04 | House: Reported from Courts of Justice with amendments (21-Y 0-N) | |
2008-01-16 | House: Assigned Courts sub: Criminal | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee for Courts of Justice | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 086191472 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB496 |