VA HB495 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-02-14 - House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
Pending: House Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Commission. Adds the City of Petersburg as a member of the Commission.
Title
Virginia Tobacco Indemnification and Community Revitalization Commission; adds membership.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-14 | House: Left in Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-30 | House: Subcommittee recommends striking from docket by voice vote | |
2012-01-18 | House: Assigned ACNRsub: Agriculture | |
2012-01-10 | House: Referred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources | |
2012-01-10 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/11/12 12102704D |
Subjects
Agriculture, Horticulture, and Food
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Petersburg, City of
Tobacco and Tobacco Products
Commissions, Boards, and Institutions Generally
Petersburg, City of
Tobacco and Tobacco Products
Code Citations
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+sum+HB495 |
Text | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?121+ful+HB495+hil |