VA HB494 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-23 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Land development; replacement of trees; locality within Chesapeake Bay watershed. Authorizes any locality within the Chesapeake Bay watershed to adopt an ordinance providing for the planting and replacement of trees during the development process. Currently, only a locality with a population density of 75 persons per square mile may adopt such an ordinance. The bill contains technical amendments.
Title
Land development; replacement of trees, locality within Chesapeake Bay watershed.
Sponsors
Del. Keith Hodges [R] | Del. Mark Keam [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-27 - House - House: VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-25 - House - House: VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-19 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-23 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0399) | |
2018-03-23 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 399 (effective 7/1/18) | |
2018-03-07 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline Midnight, April 9, 2018 | |
2018-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 7, 2018 |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2018-03-01 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2018-03-01 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB494ER) |
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-27 | House | VOTE: ADOPTION (98-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Senate amendment agreed to by House (98-Y 1-N) |
2018-02-27 | House | Placed on Calendar |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate with amendment (38-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed by Senate as amended |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Amendment by Senator Hanger agreed to |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Reading of amendment waived |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Read third time |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (13-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Local Government |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2018-01-25 | House | VOTE: BLOCK VOTE PASSAGE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-25 | House | Read third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (98-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-24 | House | Printed as engrossed 18100432D-E |
2018-01-24 | House | Engrossed by House as amended HB494E |
2018-01-24 | House | Committee amendments agreed to |
2018-01-24 | House | Read second time |
2018-01-23 | House | Read first time |
2018-01-19 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns with amendments (21-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-18 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 0-N) |
2018-01-16 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2018-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/18 18100432D |