VA HB491 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-17 - Assigned ACNR sub: Hemp
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources: Hemp Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; industrial hemp industry working group; report. Directs the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to convene a working group to assess the opportunities for development and manufacturing in the industrial hemp industry. The Department shall report the analysis of the working group by November 30, 2020, to the Chairmen of the House Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources and the Senate Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Industrial hemp; VDACS to convene work group to assess opportunities for development of industry.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-04 - House - House: VOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N) (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - House - House: Reported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N) (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-17SenateAssigned ACNR sub: Hemp
2020-02-05SenateReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Conservation and Natural Resources
2020-02-05SenateConstitutional reading dispensed
2020-02-04HouseVOTE: Block Vote Passage (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-04HouseRead third time and passed House BLOCK VOTE (99-Y 0-N)
2020-02-03HouseEngrossed by House - committee substitute HB491H1
2020-02-03HouseCommittee substitute agreed to 20106384D-H1
2020-02-03HouseRead second time
2020-01-31HouseRead first time
2020-01-29HouseCommittee substitute printed 20106384D-H1
2020-01-29HouseReported from Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources with substitute (21-Y 0-N)
2020-01-22HouseSubcommittee recommends reporting with substitute (8-Y 0-N)
2020-01-14HouseAssigned ACNR sub: Agriculture
2020-01-03HouseReferred to Committee on Agriculture, Chesapeake and Natural Resources
2020-01-03HousePrefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20100900D

Virginia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback