VA HB484 | 2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Status: Introduced on January 7 2008 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2008-02-12 - House: Left in Appropriations
Summary
Virginia Retirement System; average final compensation retirement multiplier for teachers. Increases from 1.7 to 2.0 the average final compensation retirement multiplier for teachers with 10 or more years of creditable service earned as a teacher. The bill applies to teachers first retiring on or after July 1, 2008.
Title
Retirement System; average final compensation retirement multiplier for teachers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-02-12 | House: Left in Appropriations | |
2008-01-15 | House: Assigned App. sub: Compensation and Retirement (Jones, S.C.) | |
2008-01-07 | House: Referred to Committee on Appropriations | |
2008-01-07 | House: Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/09/08 088105732 |
Subjects
Virginia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://lis.virginia.gov/cgi-bin/legp604.exe?081+sum+HB484 |