VA HB483 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-13 - Left in Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Income tax exclusion; veteran student loan forgiveness. Eliminates the sunset date and expands eligibility for the income tax exclusion for any income received by a disabled veteran of the Armed Forces of the United States from the discharge of federal student loan indebtedness.
Title
Income tax, state; veteran student loan forgiveness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | House | Left in Finance |
2024-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends laying on the table (5-Y 3-N) |
2024-01-18 | House | Assigned Finance sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Committee on Finance |
2024-01-08 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/10/24 24101305D |