VA HB451 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Left in Appropriations
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Prefiled) [HTML]
Summary
Conduct of charitable gaming. Removes restrictions regarding (i) the number of calendar days that charitable gaming may be conducted, (ii) the number of bingo sessions that may be played in any calendar day and the number of bingo games that may be played during each session, and (iii) the locations at which games may be played.
Title
Charitable gaming; removes restrictions regarding the number of calendar days that may be conducted.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (17-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (17-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - House - House: Reported from General Laws (17-Y 2-N) (Y: 17 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Left in Appropriations |
2020-02-06 | House | Referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-06 | House | Reported from General Laws (17-Y 2-N) |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends referring to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-02-04 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (7-Y 0-N) |
2020-01-17 | House | Assigned GL sub: ABC/Gaming |
2020-01-03 | House | Referred to Committee on General Laws |
2020-01-03 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/20 20103910D |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 2 | 340.19 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.24 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.25 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.27 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.27:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.28 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.28:1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
18 | 2 | 340.33 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |