VA HB443 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0255)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-08 - Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0255)
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Park authorities; electric vehicle charging stations. Gives park authorities created by a locality the authority to locate, operate, regulate the use of, and install signage relating to electric vehicle (EV) charging stations on property under its jurisdiction. The bill adds park authorities to the list of entities for which provision of electricity for EV charging is exempt from the definition of retail sale of electricity. The bill adds park authorities to the list of entities that the State Corporation Commission cannot regulate or prescribe the rates, charges, and fees for retail EV charging service.
Title
Park authorities; authority to operate, etc., electric vehicle charging stations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-28 - Senate - Senate: Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-21 - Senate - Senate: Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N 1-A) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House: VOTE: Passage (94-Y 6-N) (Y: 94 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-04 - House - House: Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-08 | Governor: Acts of Assembly Chapter text (CHAP0255) | |
2022-04-08 | Governor: Approved by Governor-Chapter 255 (effective 7/1/22) | |
2022-03-22 | Governor: Governor's Action Deadline 11:59 p.m., April 11, 2022 | |
2022-03-22 | House | Enrolled Bill communicated to Governor on March 22, 2022 |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Signed by President |
2022-03-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2022-03-07 | House | Bill text as passed House and Senate (HB443ER) |
2022-03-07 | House | Enrolled |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Read third time |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Passed by temporarily |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed (40-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Reported from Local Government (15-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred to Local Government |
2022-02-21 | Senate | Rereferred from Commerce and Labor (13-Y 0-N 1-A) |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Constitutional reading dispensed |
2022-02-10 | House | VOTE: Passage (94-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-10 | House | Read third time and passed House (94-Y 6-N) |
2022-02-09 | House | Read second time and engrossed |
2022-02-08 | House | Read first time |
2022-02-04 | House | Reported from Counties, Cities and Towns (22-Y 0-N) |
2022-02-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (8-Y 1-N) |
2022-02-02 | House | Assigned CC & T sub: Subcommittee #2 |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred to Committee on Counties, Cities and Towns |
2022-02-01 | House | Referred from Commerce and Energy by voice vote |
2022-01-11 | House | Referred to Committee on Commerce and Energy |
2022-01-11 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/12/22 22101682D |