VA HB426 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Tabled in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-04 - Tabled in Transportation by voice vote
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
I-66 improvements. Requires the Commonwealth Transportation Board to include in the next update of its Six-Year Improvement Program a project to add at least two non-high-occupancy vehicle lanes in each direction to I-66 inside the Capital Beltway.
Title
Interstate 66; CTB to include in next update certain improvements inside Capital Beltway.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-23 - House - House: Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 10-N) (Y: 12 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-22 - House - House: Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-04 | House | Tabled in Transportation by voice vote |
2014-01-29 | House | Rereferred to Transportation |
2014-01-29 | House | Motion to rerefer to committee agreed to |
2014-01-28 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-27 | House | Passed by for the day |
2014-01-24 | House | Read first time |
2014-01-23 | House | Committee substitute printed 14104319D-H1 |
2014-01-23 | House | Reported from Transportation with substitute (12-Y 10-N) |
2014-01-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends reporting (6-Y 1-N) |
2014-01-10 | House | Assigned Transportation sub: Subcommittee #1 |
2014-01-04 | House | Referred to Committee on Transportation |
2014-01-04 | House | Prefiled and ordered printed; offered 01/08/14 14103134D |